+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Green.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor