+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3147), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-17-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor