+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/TEC, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.