+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3381) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3228), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 1:16PM in conference room 016.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.