+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2).
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, JDL.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor