+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3234), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-29-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/CPH, WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor