+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3227), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, CPH.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor