+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Matsumoto.
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 04-13-18 4:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 506) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House.
- Adopted.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-18.
- Waived referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3286), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR/CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor