+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-03-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.