+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 3:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.