+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1349) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/LCA.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor