+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Kawakami, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Kong, Ward.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 04-14-16 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 428).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3392) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDL.
- Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3145), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-22-16 1:25PM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM, JDL.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor