+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1547) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/PSM.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 9:45AM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor