+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 646).
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1768-16), recommending adoption.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tokioka, Ward.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-22-16 2:05PM in conference room 308.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha, Thielen.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-14-16 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 427) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3408) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA.
- Offered.