+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-29-21.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:20PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor