+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 06-30-20.
- Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3711) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/WTL.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Offered.