+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-18.
- Reported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-18 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/CPH.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor