+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDL.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3096), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, JDL.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor