+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.