+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted.
- Waived referral to JDL.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3101), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:35PM in conference room 224.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.