+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PSM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3267), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to PSM.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-20-18 3:05PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, PSM.
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor