+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 04-12-17 11:15AM in conference room 325.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-23-17.
- Reported from WTL/HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/HRE/AEN.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.