+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1) with Senators Baker, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, San Buenaventura, and Wakai voting "Aye, with reservations".
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-23-21.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN.
- Offered.