+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRN/PDP, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.