+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-15 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 229.
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor