+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor