+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 51
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454).
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-28-18.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3216) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU.
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor