+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3290), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/CPH deferred the measure until 03-27-18 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM.
- Offered.