+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1731), recommending referral to CPC.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 31
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 442) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-25-21.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1111) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/AEN.
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor