+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3393) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDL.
- Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3146), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-22-16 1:25PM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM, JDL.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor