+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 734).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-29-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1714-14), recommending adoption.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 308.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 442).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3236) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2865), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Slom.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 1:30PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor