+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 597).
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826), recommending adoption.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
- Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1772), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Say, Fukumoto.
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 04-13-17 11:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 41
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 417).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 997), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor