+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent.
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643) with recommendation of adoption.
- One Day Notice 04-05-23.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, McKelvey.
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/PSM.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor