+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2976), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-18-14 1:20PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/TEC, WAM.
- Offered.