+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2011-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 04-12-18 11:30AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3469) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-18 10:25AM in conference room 211.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WAM.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor