+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 861).
- Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 861).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-27-21.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-21.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601).
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1904) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 34
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from HTH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/JDC.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor