+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3315) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2873), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor