+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1845) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-21-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor