+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-18.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3387) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:15PM in conference room 225.
- Referred to TRE.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.