+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from TOU/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2018-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott.
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, LoPresti, Woodson.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU/TRN on Friday, 04-13-18 9:35AM in conference room 423.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TOU/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3450) with recommendation of adoption.
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to CPH.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3263), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-27-18 2:55PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, CPH.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.