+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:16PM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
- Offered.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor