+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.