+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 48
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 408) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-15.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Slom.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor