+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-12-19.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 840).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2293), recommending adoption.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2267), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:40AM in conference room 325.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 632).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1841) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.