+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-11-13.
- Reported from HMS/TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/TIA/PSM.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor