+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM/JDL.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3214), with recommendation of referral to WAM/JDL.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.