+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH/EEP/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 49
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553).
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-02-19.
- Reported from GVO/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/AEN.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.