+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Slom).
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-02-13.
- Reported from TIA/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi, Solomon.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA/ENE.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor