+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/AGR/WAL, referral sheet 50
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from PSM/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3188) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 04-01-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-14 3:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/ENE.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor