+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
- Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 32
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- One Day Notice 03-31-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:45PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor